Al Matrafi, Jamila Mohammed Ateeg (CPSO#: 87267)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010