Al Mutairi, Bander Abdulaziz Sulaiman (CPSO#: 84884)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008