Al Mutairi, Dakheelallah Mohammed Saeed Abdul Hadi (CPSO#: 90275)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Mar 2009 to 31 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2011 to 20 May 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2011