Al Mutawa, Fatimah Hussain (CPSO#: 92675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46311
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATIMAH HUSSAIN AL MUTAWA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL MUTAWA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL MUTAWA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL MUTAWA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL MUTAWA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL MUTAWA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL MUTAWA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 17 May 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019