Al Nashmi, Tofol Ahmed Musa (CPSO#: 93854)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 02 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014