Al Obaidli, Ali Abdul Kareem Al Redha (CPSO#: 74318)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 22 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 22 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2000 to 22 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2001 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2002 to 22 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2003 to 22 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2005