Al Rasheed, Feryal Ayesh Abdullah (CPSO#: 80113)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2003 to 07 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2004 to 07 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006