Al Ruwaih, Aiman Hamad Abd Allatif (CPSO#: 84161)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2006 to 23 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2007