Al Saleh, Hani Qasem A M (CPSO#: 92732)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016