Al Sarraf, Adel Abdulrasoul Hasan Mohammad (CPSO#: 77858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 836-8695
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Al Sarraf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al Sarraf ( CPSO# 77858 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
200 Church Street
Weston ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 249-8111

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
2111 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 1N1

Business Address:
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL ABDULRASOUL HASAN MOHAMMAD AL SARRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SARRAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Apr 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007