Al Sawi, Mohamed Ali Mahmoud (CPSO#: 84910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 5196212330
Fax: 5197404938
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al Sawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al Sawi ( CPSO# 84910 )

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ALI MAHMOUD AL SAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009