Al Shabanah, Hasan Abdulaziz H (CPSO#: 77045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 & 12 - 965 Bovaird Dr W
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AlShabanah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2012


Corporation Name: AlShabanah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al Shabanah ( CPSO# 77045 )

Business Address:
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2

Business Address:
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
965 Bovaird Drive West
Unit 11 & 12
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASAN ABDULAZIZ H AL SHABANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SHABANAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016