Al Shamsi, Fayez Ebrahim Fayez (CPSO#: 90381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
College of Medicine & Health Scienc
Department of Internal Medicine
UAE University
Al Ain 17666
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +971505513300
Fax: +97137672995

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAYEZ EBRAHIM FAYEZ AL SHAMSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SHAMSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013