Al Shamsi, Mohamed Salim Mohamed (CPSO#: 81840)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2004 to 29 Sep 2004
PEAP - Resident - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2012