Al Shehri, Mohamed Abdullah Mohamed (CPSO#: 85613)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 23 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2006 to 30 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2007