Al Sufiani, Fahd Mayouf Hasan (CPSO#: 91610)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Aug 2009
PEAP - Resident - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 2010 to 10 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2012 to 11 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 May 2012 to 11 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015