Al Twairgi, Abdullah Khalaf Abdulrahman (CPSO#: 89090)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Aug 2008
PEAP - Resident - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 21 Aug 2008 to 20 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 21 Aug 2009 to 20 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 21 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012