Al Zahrani, Nasser Othman Maeed (CPSO#: 96517)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013