Al-Aama, Tareef Yousef Adeeb (CPSO#: 79291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King abdulaziz university
Jeddah 21589
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966126401000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAREEF YOUSEF ADEEB AL-AAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2003 to 11 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 16 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009