Al-Abdullah, Tawfik Sulieman A. (CPSO#: 74512)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004