Al-Abri, Mohamed Said Salim (CPSO#: 89723)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010