AlAli, Abdulaziz Saad S (CPSO#: 86127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Critical Care Medicine
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4746
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ SAAD S ALALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016