Al-Amodi, Hussein Abdullah Omar (CPSO#: 96744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hadhramout Univ of Science & Technology, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of Caridac Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Sep 2011 to 12 Jan 2012
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2012 to 12 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Hussein Abdullah Omar Al-Amodi may practise cardiac surgery at London
                  Health  Sciences  Centre  -  University Hospital and Victoria Hospital in
                  London,  Ontario, while under supervision  coordinated  by  a  supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Al-Amodi's eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Al-Amodi's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Al-Amodi's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2018, and  will expire on or before
                  June 30, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.