Al-Ardati, Hosam Adnan Abdulqader (CPSO#: 78977)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2003 to 06 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - General Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008