Al-Areibi, Arif Ramadane Abdullah (CPSO#: 79157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Victoria Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
And Periop Medicine Room D2-315
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Areibi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Areibi ( CPSO# 79157 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia & Periop Medicine
Room D2-315
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF RAMADANE ABDULLAH AL-AREIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AREIBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008