Al-Asiri, Jamal Ali Naser (CPSO#: 88239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2014

Expiry Date:  19 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Aug 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room 5N-533
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 24 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jamal  Ali  Naser  Al-Asiri  may practise orthopaedic surgery at the
                  Hamilton General Hospital, in Hamilton,  Ontario, while under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration will automatically  expire  on August 26,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Al-Asiri's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Al-Asiri's practice.
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining  to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Al-Asiri's practice unsatisfactory. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August 27, 2014 and currently  has  an
                  interim  expiry  date  of  June  19,  2019.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to  the  limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.