Al-Atassi, Talal (CPSO#: 91030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Institut
40 Ruskin Street
Suite H3404-B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7293
Fax: (613) 696-7118
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talal Al-Atassi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Al-Atassi ( CPSO# 91030 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite H3404B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7293

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALAL AL-ATASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ATASSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2017