Al-Attar, Salam Akram Ali (CPSO#: 97865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Mountainash Road
Springdale Square, Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: 416-750-1500
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Dusk Dr #1
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Canada
Phone: 905-451-9999
Fax: 905-456-8998
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3530 Derry Road East
Unit 110-111
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Canada
Phone: 905-672-2273
Fax: 905-672-0487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 3
65 Bradyon Blvd
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 794-7649
Fax: 905-794-7650
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 110-111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Canada
Phone: 905-672-2273
Fax: 905-672-0487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 2
4000 Hwy 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

450 Blanche Street
Petrolia, Ontario
N0N 1R0
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 882-4325
Fax: (519) 882-3711
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salam A. Al-Attar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Attar ( CPSO# 97865 )

Business Address:
8-51 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALAM AKRAM ALI AL-ATTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ATTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015