AlAwamy, Mohammed Baker H (CPSO#: 86053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-9228
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2227 South Millway
Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: 905-569-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Baker H. AlAwamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. AlAwamy ( CPSO# 86053 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hosptial
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Multi-Specialty Clinic
21 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
303 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED BAKER H ALAWAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAWAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013