Al-Azem, Hafsah (CPSO#: 96165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The University of Ottawa
Health Services
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Arthritis Centre
The Ottawa Hospital
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: 613-738-8400 Ext. 81840
Fax: 613-738-8336
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAFSAH AL-AZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AZEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017