Al-Backr, Hanan Backr Rashid (CPSO#: 75738)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Oct 2000 to 30 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 26 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2007