AlBadr, Suha Hassan T (CPSO#: 94718)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012