Al-Baher, Sami Faris M (CPSO#: 94890)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chuvash State University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2011 to 09 Jul 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013