Al-Busaidi, Mujahid Rafa'a Hilal (CPSO#: 85969)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 29 Apr 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013