Al-Douri, Faten M (CPSO#: 81593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saddam College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36009
Fax: (905) 521-6063
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300


Corporation Name: Dr.Faten Al-Douri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )

Business Address:
St Joseph Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEN M AL-DOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009