AlFaraj, Fatimah Ahmed M (CPSO#: 91471)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Aug 2009
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2009 to 18 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2010 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2011 to 18 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2017