AlFouzan, Maram Abdullah H. (CPSO#: 93784)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012