Al-Gethami, Mohammed Mesfer S (CPSO#: 87140)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Resident - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010