Al-Ghaithy, Waleed Abed Mohamed (CPSO#: 82397)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2011