AlGhamdi, Abdulaziz Mohammed J (CPSO#: 94536)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2013