Al-Ghamdi, Abdullah Ahmed Mohammed (CPSO#: 74494)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2002