AlGhamdi, Abdullah Ali Mohammed AlMagnae (CPSO#: 80114)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Sep 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 03 Oct 2003
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 04 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2006