Al-Ghamdi, Bader Jammah Hamed (CPSO#: 94667)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 03 Jan 2011 to 27 Mar 2011
PEAP - Resident - Respirology

Queen's University, 28 Mar 2011 to 27 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 28 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013