Al-Ghamdi, Maha Musfer Khamis (CPSO#: 82298)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2006