Al-Ghamdi, Mohammad Yousef A (CPSO#: 79913)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005