AlGhamdi, Samirah Ali Saeed (CPSO#: 85763)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 16 Nov 2006 to 29 Nov 2006
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 30 Nov 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2009 to 05 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 06 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011