Al-Ghamdi, Sharifah Ali (CPSO#: 73146)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006