Al-Habib, Saed Saeed (CPSO#: 76933)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2015