Al-Hajri, Munirah Abdullah Ibrahim (CPSO#: 71793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Medical Group
4289 Innes Rd
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Hajri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Hajri ( CPSO# 71793 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Medical Group
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNIRAH ABDULLAH IBRAHIM AL-HAJRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAJRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007