Al-Hanoot, Ibraheem Khalifa Salman (CPSO#: 92700)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011